SUDERSHAN KUMAR GARG
-
About SUDERSHAN KUMAR GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27105HR1979PLC009913 JINDAL STEEL AND POWER LIMITED 916444234.0 Active 09/11/2012 - U04010CT1995PLC008985 JINDAL POWER LIMITED 13488000000.0 Active 26/04/2012 - U40101AR2009PLC008275 ETALIN HYDRO ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY LIMITED 7400000.0 Active 29/04/2015 - U40102AR2010PLC008301 KAMALA HYDRO ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY LIMITED 7400000.0 Active 17/06/2013 - -
Associated with Directors