SURINDER KUMAR SACHDEVA
-
About SURINDER KUMAR SACHDEVA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U70101DL2004PTC129378 MIRAN PROMOTERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/09/2004 - U74899DL1982PTC013938 SACHDEVA PROMOTERS AND PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 503500.0 Active 28/06/1982 - U74899DL1994PTC062510 K G FINLEASE PRIVATE LIMITED 6337100.0 Active 02/02/1996 - U91990DL1956PLC001601 CHELMSFORD CLUB LTD 0.0 Active 29/09/2012 - -
Associated with Directors