SUDHIR THACKERSEY
-
About SUDHIR THACKERSEY,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L17110MH1882PLC000045 THE HINDOOSTAN SPINNING AND WEAVING MILLS LIMITED 147839000.0 Amalgamated 01/04/1970 - U28920MH1948PLC006529 ART LEATHER LIMITED 630000.0 Amalgamated 29/12/2004 - U45200MH1975PTC018167 COSMOS ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 2400000.0 Active 08/03/2007 - U45990MH1974PLC017305 DELTA INVESTMENTS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 02/11/1974 - U51100MH1996PLC100126 CAPRICON REALTY LIMITED 99000.0 Active 08/09/2004 - U51100MH1996PTC100127 URANUS TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 40499820.0 Active 25/11/1998 - U51900MH1996PLC104746 BHISHMA REALTY LIMITED 98920.0 Active 08/09/2004 - U51900MH1996PTC100811 MAHARSHI TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/10/1996 - U65990MH1976PTC018974 PAURA INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 20/12/1993 - U65990MH1981PTC024551 LEATHBIND INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 755200.0 Amalgamated 22/12/1993 - U67120MH1976PTC018933 DEVAUNSHI INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/12/2006 - U67120MH1984PTC033606 PREFERENTIAL INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 2075000.0 Active 22/11/1993 - U80300MH1928GAP001375 VANITA VISHRAM 0.0 Active 18/06/1994 - -
Associated with Directors