SANJAY KUMAR KEJRIWAL
-
About SANJAY KUMAR KEJRIWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L15421WB1890PLC000612 TYROON TEA CO LTD 34021000.0 Active 17/07/2014 - L65993WB1983PLC035908 DEV KUNJ TRADE ENTERPRISES LTD 2490000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U24116WB1984PTC037543 SHRADDHA RESINS & CHEMICALS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Amalgamated 17/07/2006 - U24118WB1992PLC055994 ACME CHEM LTD 58600000.0 Active 15/03/2015 - U52300WB1920PLC003730 JAMES ALEXANDER & CO LTD 1000000.0 Active 28/11/1996 - U60221WB1982PLC035334 MANGAL BHAGYA EXPORTS (INDIA) LTD. 2450000.0 Active 25/06/1996 - U70109WB1960PLC024720 TEMPLE PROPERTIES LTD 674000.0 Active 07/11/2011 - U74999WB2010PTC154181 DEVI MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/10/2010 - -
Associated with Directors