SUGANDHA JAIDEV HIREMATH
-
About SUGANDHA JAIDEV HIREMATH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L24200MH1988PTC048028 HIKAL LIMITED 164401000.0 Active 05/02/1992 - U24231MH2005PTC157904 CASTILIA LIFE SCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 08/03/2007 - U32109MH1984PTC191770 DECENT ELECTRONICS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/12/1988 - U65910MH1982PTC180438 SHRI BADRINATH INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100040.0 Active 25/10/1983 - U65993MH1982PTC178780 SHRI RAMESWARA INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100040.0 Active 18/01/1988 - U65993MH1985PTC191864 MARIGOLD INVESTMENT PVT LTD 8500020.0 Active 26/06/1995 - U65993MH1987PTC190524 EKADANT INVESTMENT PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 19/04/1989 - U67190MH1995PTC095613 RUSHABH CAPITAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100200.0 Active 21/02/2007 - U74140MH1985PTC190549 KARAD ENGINEERING CONSULTANCY PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 26/12/1988 - -
Associated with Directors