SUNIL YASHAWANT SURVE
-
About SUNIL YASHAWANT SURVE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L17119MH1984PLC217694 ABHINANDAN ENTERPRISES LIMITED 11550000.0 Active 27/07/1992 - L29224MH1984PLC217693 SHRI GURUDEV EN-TRADE LTD 10760000.0 Active 27/07/1992 - L51900MH1985PLC034965 VISHVPRABHA TRADING LTD 2450000.0 Active 01/03/1995 - L51909MH1984PLC217692 BHAIRAV ENTERPRISES LTD 10000000.0 Active 23/01/1996 - L51909MH1984PLC217695 RISHABH ENTERPRISES LTD 10000000.0 Active 03/03/1995 - L74999MH1984PLC034746 MRUGESH TRADING LTD 2450000.0 Active 03/03/1995 - U51900MH1998PTC115578 EMPIRE CONTINENTAL EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Converted to LLP 17/09/2012 -