SHIVSHANKAR GARG
-
About SHIVSHANKAR GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U02710MP2006PTC018576 KALYAN IRON AND STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 3267100.0 Active 15/01/2010 - U27106MP1995PTC010177 KALYAN ISPAT (INDIA) PVT LTD 2184000.0 Active 20/02/1996 - U45200MP2010PTC023460 SSG NAV-NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/04/2010 - U45200MP2011PTC025784 SHIV INFRAESTATE (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 15/04/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
SUDHIR KUMAR GARG Director RADHA GARG Director KALYANMAL GARG Director DINESH AGRAWAL Director