SUCHETA OMPRAKASH GOENKA
-
About SUCHETA OMPRAKASH GOENKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17118MH2003PTC138831 D.SQUARE SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/02/2016 - U51311MH2004PTC144282 ECOSCAPES INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/12/2015 - U52100MH2007PTC173743 STARTEX IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/12/2015 - U55101MH2009PTC193829 WISTERIA HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U55101MH2009PTC193834 NOUVELLE CUISINE PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U55101MH2009PTC193836 PEACH HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U55101PN2008PTC138017 MIND SPACE HOTELS AND RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 90000000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U70100MH2010PTC204578 IHITA ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/01/2012 - U70101MH2004PTC146032 TRUEWORTH PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/04/2004 - U70101MH2004PTC146056 LUXORA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2833330.0 Active 05/05/2004 - U70102MH2007PTC167760 D.SQUARE REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U70200MH2007PTC167761 APOTHEOSIS INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 3000000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U72200MH1995PTC087544 MOHIT SOFTWARE AND COMMUNICATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 1159000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U74140MH2008PTC187527 FOREVISION ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U74990MH2008PTC188029 MIRAH BRANDS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U74990MH2009PTC190924 PRUNIER ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors