SHRIKANT MUNDRA
-
About SHRIKANT MUNDRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U14107RJ2011PTC033792 SHREE MINTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/04/2011 - U15400GJ2012PTC072277 SHRI MERRITS AGRO INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 105000.0 Active 10/10/2012 - U17110GJ1994PTC021857 SUDARSHAN TEXTILES PRIVATE LIMITED 5798000.0 Active 21/04/1994 - U17120MH2009PTC196177 MADHUSUDAN FILAMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2009 - U74994GJ2006PTC048513 SUDAMO IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 17187100.0 Active 20/06/2006 - -
Associated with Directors