SUDHIR KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About SUDHIR KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L29130RJ1990PLC005370 AKS BEARINGS LTD 16257630.0 Active 30/03/1990 - U14219RJ1996PTC012511 OXFORD DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 13958000.0 Active 01/11/2004 - U45201RJ1994PTC021538 JEETISH PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED(TRANSFERRED FROM NCT OF DELHI) 525150.0 Active 04/03/2005 - U52190RJ2006PTC022544 SHIV SHAKTI EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 23/05/2006 - U65999RJ2018PTC060274 BHG FINCAP PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 21/02/2018 - -
Associated with Directors