SUDHIR JALAN
-
About SUDHIR JALAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L40109WB1928PLC023311 THE SHAHJAHANPUR ELECTRIC SUPPLY CO.LTD. 4548000.0 Active 09/08/1971 - U01122KA2004PTC034756 NEO FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 65000000.0 Active 18/06/2012 - U01132WB1991PTC051012 DHAWALGIRI HOLDINGS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 20/08/2010 - U29196TN2005PLC057662 RICE LAKE WEIGHING SYSTEMS INDIA LIMITED 80000000.0 Active 16/03/2006 - U33112WB1988PLC045223 APOLLO GLENEAGLES HOSPITAL LIMITED 1093513940.0 Active 21/05/2015 - U51420WB1933PLC007661 SUBLIME AGRO LTD 50000000.0 Active 21/05/1993 - U67120WB1974PTC029334 ANCHOR INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 6572500.0 Active 20/08/2010 - U70200KA2004PTC033851 ASA HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 195000000.0 Active 29/04/2004 - U72900KA1999PLC047267 BELLS SOFTECH LIMITED 50000000.0 Active 01/04/1999 - U72900KA2000PTC026328 BRAR PROPERTIES AND HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Active 09/10/2003 - U74899PN1995PTC139264 RIETER INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 89530630.0 Active 01/05/2008 - U93000MH2013PTC240085 CONEXUS SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 11/11/2013 - -
Associated with Directors