SUSHIL KUMAR PODDAR
-
About SUSHIL KUMAR PODDAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L74140WB1994PLC061497 LYONS CORPORATE MARKET LTD 46780000.0 Active 12/04/1999 - U51109WB2007PTC120575 B R P TRADELINKS PRIVATE LIMITED 1530000.0 Active 23/11/2007 - U51909WB1995PTC070725 AAINA ENGINEERING PVT..LTD. 15349100.0 Active 18/09/2001 - U51909WB2005PTC103681 B.R. PODDAR MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 7150000.0 Active 10/06/2005 - U51909WB2006PTC112149 PODDAR MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 6725000.0 Active 19/12/2006 - U51909WB2009PTC131728 K L PODDAR TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 1835000.0 Active 06/01/2009 - U51909WB2010PTC150408 DIGVIJAY AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/01/2013 - -
Associated with Directors