SURESHKUMAR RAMNARAYAN SHARMA
-
About SURESHKUMAR RAMNARAYAN SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24232UP1994PLC016911 BAIDYANATH RESEARCH FOUNDATION LIMITED 4925700.0 Active 20/07/1999 - U24233WB1947PTC015374 SHREE BAIDYANATH AYURVED BHAWAN PVT LTD 3000000.0 Active 01/04/1975 - U51900MH1986PTC041725 PRASIDH POWER TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 15556000.0 Active 30/06/1989 - U51900MH1988PTC045960 NOVA MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 16974500.0 Active 18/07/1992 - U51900MH1988PTC045961 UPDATE MARKETINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 16094000.0 Active 15/09/1989 - U51909WB2003PTC163066 NAGPUR COMMODITIES AND SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1100000.0 Amalgamated 19/11/2003 - U65923MH1994PTC080837 ALBELI LEASING AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 16/08/1995 - U74999MH2009PTC219621 BAIDYANATH ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 1600000.0 Active 27/11/2009 - U85100MH2009PTC194159 BAIDYANATH LIFE SCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/07/2009 - U99999MH1961PLC012036 VIDARBHA PAPER MILLS LIMITED 49500000.0 Amalgamated 05/06/1999 - -
Associated with Directors