SANJAY PREMJI SHAH
-
About SANJAY PREMJI SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L45202MH1949PLC007048 SHAH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LIMITED 498125000.0 Active 30/09/1995 - U24110MH1984PTC034887 MIAAMI LABORATORIES PVT LTD 6145000.0 Active 20/07/2010 - U45200MH2004PTC149066 SPENTA TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/10/2004 - U45200MH2005PTC151470 SPENTA INFRASTRUCTURE AND DEVELOPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/02/2005 - U45207MH2007PTC174111 MAZDA INFRASTRUCTURE DEVELOPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/09/2007 - U51100MH1955PTC009589 KOTWAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/02/2011 - U51900MH1996PTC102454 ATUL TRADING AND FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/08/2003 - U67120MH1995PTC088433 TRIPLE SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 118500.0 Active 05/02/2000 - U67190MH1993PTC074292 VALBROS FINANCIAL CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/11/2003 - U70100MH1995PTC086675 SPENTA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/01/2005 - U70100MH2002PTC136384 MAZDA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/06/2003 - U70100MH2002PTC137485 AHURA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/04/2009 - U70101MH1999PTC122149 SPENTA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/10/1999 - U72200MH2000PTC125040 NIRMAL TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/04/2001 - -
Associated with Directors