SUREN CHANDRAKANT SHAH
-
About SUREN CHANDRAKANT SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U14200ML2007PTC008479 KAUSTHUBHA MINERALS PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 07/10/2013 - U14219AS2008PTC010790 NAGAUR POTASH AND MINERALS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 16/12/2013 - U17110MH2001PTC133530 SRESTHA ARTS AND COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 09/12/2013 - U45400MH2011PTC215143 ARYABHATA INFRASTRUCTURE AND HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2011 - U61100MH1979PTC021890 EXPRESS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 09/12/2013 - U65921MH2011PTC215138 VAKKSH HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 55765000.0 Active 23/03/2011 - U67190MH2008PTC177733 VAKKSH TRUSTEESHIP SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 30/07/2010 - U73100MP2012NPL029614 ADELIKA RESEARCH AND AGRICULTURAL INSTITUTE 0.0 Active 03/06/2013 - U85100MP2013NPL031119 VAKKSH FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 10/07/2013 - -
Associated with Directors