SHRENIK KUMAR NARENDRAKUMAR BALDOTA
-
About SHRENIK KUMAR NARENDRAKUMAR BALDOTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U13100MH1961PLC012160 MSPL LIMITED 384000000.0 Active 03/09/2015 - U23201MH2006PLC158596 MSPL GASES LIMITED 7500000.0 Active 03/01/2006 - U24110MH2006PTC159964 GOOD EARTH CHEMICALS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 23/02/2006 - U24111KA1975PLC002860 VIJAYA OXYGEN COMPANY LIMITED 35400000.0 Active 28/03/1996 - U27101KA1978PLC003360 RAMGAD MINERALS AND MINING LIMITED 4400000.0 Active 01/02/1999 - U27103KA2005PLC037892 AARESS IRON AND STEEL LIMITED 9500000.0 Active 08/12/2005 - U85110KA1992PLC013538 VIJAYANAGAR INDUSTRIAL CREDITS LIMITED. 14979900.0 Active 16/09/1992 - -
Associated with Directors