SANJAY KARSANDAS THAKKER
-
About SANJAY KARSANDAS THAKKER,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22219MH1981PTC024336 ANKAN PRINTERS PVT LTD 10006200.0 Active 20/05/1991 - U24231GJ1994PTC023875 LANDMARK AUTOMOBILES PRIVATE LIMITED 17614520.0 Active 01/06/1998 - U45200MH1999PTC118510 EKTA HOUSEMAKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/11/2002 - U50100GJ2006PTC058553 LANDMARK CARS PRIVATE LIMITED 79126000.0 Active 23/02/2006 - U50100GJ2008PTC054848 AUTOMARK MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 26214000.0 Active 03/05/2011 - U50100GJ2012PTC069390 LANDMARK COMMERCIAL VEHICLES PRIVATE LIMITED 15725520.0 Active 13/03/2012 - U50400GJ2003PTC057309 LANDMARK PRE-OWNED CARS PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 18/05/2010 - U50400GJ2016PTC094085 BENCHMARK MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 260000000.0 Active 14/10/2016 - U50404GJ2013PTC073332 LANDMARK CARS (EAST) PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 10/01/2013 - U50500GJ2016PTC094392 WATERMARK CARS PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 16/11/2016 - U51909MH2005PTC151208 WILD DREAMS TRADING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 10/02/2005 - U66030PN2002PTC017009 LANDMARK INSURANCE BROKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 34500000.0 Active 12/01/2010 - U70100MH1993PTC071780 KAMLESH REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/07/1993 - U70101MH1934PTC002097 SEWRI LAND COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 4968090.0 Active 20/06/1988 - U92190GJ2012PTC071126 WILD DREAMS MEDIA AND COMMUNICATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 16/07/2012 - -
Associated with Directors