SANDEEP VITTHAL MEGHE
-
About SANDEEP VITTHAL MEGHE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01100MH1996PTC098970 SHREE SAINATH AGRO FIELDS PRIVATE LIMITED 869000.0 Active 18/01/2012 - U45200MH2004PTC144644 RAGHAV INFRADEVELOPERS AND BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 31798200.0 Active 01/03/2012 - U45201MH2012PTC232720 SMG REALITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/06/2012 - U67120MH1997PTC110496 SMG INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 15300000.0 Active 30/03/2012 - U74120MH2012PTC231998 RADHA RIDDHI ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/11/2013 - U80301MH2011NPL214511 VIDYARTHI SUDHAR SANGH FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 09/03/2011 - U85110MH2005PTC154876 SMG HOSPITALS PRIVATE LIMITED 49128000.0 Active 20/01/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
MAHENDRA ROSHANSINGH THAKUR Director SAYAJI VISHWANATH JADHAO Director MANISH BALRAM VAIDYA Director