SACHIN BHAGWANDAS TALWAR
-
About SACHIN BHAGWANDAS TALWAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U65990MH1999PTC120251 SAROJA BHAGWANDAS INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/06/1999 - U67120MH1991PTC061203 ROPRIRAJ INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 480300.0 Active 12/11/2010 - U74130MH1986PTC038724 ROGER PEREIRA COMMUNICATION PVT LTD 982200.0 Active 01/01/2000 - U74140MH2010PTC209890 TURNING POINT BRAND CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/11/2010 -