SHRINIVAS GOVINDRAO SHIRGURKAR
-
About SHRINIVAS GOVINDRAO SHIRGURKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L85110KA1980PLC003913 WENDT INDIA LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 17/04/2006 - U02922KA1987PLC008415 AUTO CNC MACHINING LIMITED 3646500.0 Active 11/06/1987 - U29199KA1986PLC007816 ACE DESIGNERS LIMITED 142400000.0 Active 25/09/1986 - U29290MH1973GAP016420 INDIAN MACHINE TOOL MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 29/08/2012 - U34300KA2005PTC037594 PRAGATI TRANSMISSION PRIVATE LIMITED. 5000000.0 Active 03/11/2005 - U72200KA2013PTC070078 ACEMICROMATIC MANUFACTURING INTELLIGENCE TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 6450000.0 Active 26/07/2013 - U85110KA1994PLC015321 ACE MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS LIMITED 7640000.0 Active 07/03/1994 - U85110KA1995PLC018544 ACE MULTI AXES SYSTEMS LIMITED 3176000.0 Active 16/08/1995 - -
Associated with Directors