SUBHASH KELKAR
-
About SUBHASH KELKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15139TN2012PTC086911 HEXAGON NUTRITION (EXPORTS) PRIVATE LIMITED 67574660.0 Active 24/07/2012 - U15146TN2012PTC089163 HEXAGON NUTRITION (INTERNATIONAL) PRIVATE LIMITED 6400000.0 Active 01/10/2015 - U24110MH1993PTC072189 HEXAGON NUTRITION PRIVATE LIMITED 231967024.0 Active 27/05/1993 - U74120MH2011PTC219924 SUNRISE NUTRITION PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/07/2011 - U74120MH2014PTC258965 NUTRALYTICA RESEARCH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/10/2014 - -
Associated with Directors