SANDRA RAJNIKANT SHROFF
-
About SANDRA RAJNIKANT SHROFF,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L24219GJ1969PLC001588 UNIPHOS ENTERPRISES LIMITED 139092000.0 Active 29/05/1969 - L24219GJ1985PLC025132 UPL LIMITED 1483542604.0 Active 01/10/1992 - L99999MH1985PLC036391 NIVI TRADING LIMITED 12456000.0 Active 02/03/1992 - U24219GJ1992PLC027317 UNIPHOS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 66052200.0 Active 04/06/1993 - U24299GJ1979PLC003583 SHROFFS UNITED CHEMICALS LIMITED 500070.0 Active 20/12/1979 - U29297GJ2007PTC052025 UNIPHOS ENVIROTRONIC PRIVATE LIMITED 270100000.0 Active 01/07/2015 - U29309GJ1998PTC035241 SHROFF ENVIROTRAL PRIVATE LIMITED 104000.0 Active 31/12/1998 - U45300GJ1997PLC032696 BHARUCH ENVIRO INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 41860340.0 Active 03/04/1998 - U65990GJ1986PTC027312 DEMURIC HOLDINGS PVT LTD(TR CO FROM MAHARASHTRA) 62959600.0 Active 08/04/1992 - U72200GJ1994PLC023786 ENVIRO TECHNOLOGY LIMITED 27289620.0 Active 07/12/1994 - U73100GJ2012PTC072922 JRF RESEARCH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/12/2012 - -
Associated with Directors