SARIN RAKESH
-
About SARIN RAKESH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45203TN2004PLC052443 IG3 INFRA LIMITED 5273399410.0 Active 11/11/2005 - U51909TN1995PTC033278 AKSHAY COMMUNICATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 18/10/1995 - U65991TN1988PTC016279 AKSHAY MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 01/04/1989 - U65991TN1993PTC026268 AASHNA INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 4722000.0 Active 25/11/1993 - U72900MH2000PLC129159 NADIADWALA ENTERTAINMENT AND TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED 26000000.0 Active 29/04/2013 - -
Associated with Directors