SUNITA MITTAL
-
About SUNITA MITTAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400DL2011PLC215912 RADO INFRASTRUCTURALS LIMITED 3475000.0 Active 16/03/2011 - U51909DL1998PTC093398 HYCAL SYSTEM ENGINEERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100200.0 Active 13/06/2011 - U70102DL2011PTC225079 UNITY BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/08/2017 - U70109DL2006PTC153610 CORPORATE BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 14045000.0 Active 29/09/2012 - U70200DL2012PTC240201 VEGA BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/08/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
PARMOD KUMAR MITTAL Director KARAN PAL SINGAL Director SEEMA GUPTA Director