SUKHDEV SINGH CHADHA
-
About SUKHDEV SINGH CHADHA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400DL2007PTC161905 HYDRO INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/05/2007 - U60200DL2009PTC193530 LORRYWALA CARGO MOVERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/08/2009 - U72900CH2016PTC041133 CARGOWALA BIZCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/07/2016 - U74996DL2006PTC149877 CHOJIS DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/06/2006 - -
Associated with Directors
VINOD KRISHAN AHUJA Director AJAY AHUJA Director JATINDER PAL SABHARWAL Director SANJEET SINGH Director