SHEELA ANAND PURANIK
-
About SHEELA ANAND PURANIK,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24239MH1998PTC115960 SOLUMIKS LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/07/1998 - U51507MH1987PTC045496 SOLMAARC MARKETING AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/01/1988 - U51900MH1993PTC070704 RED AQUATECH AND INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/02/1993 - U73200MH1996NPL099854 SHREE DHOOTAPAPESHWAR AYURVEDIC RESEARCH FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 27/05/1996 - -
Associated with Directors
ANAND GANGADHAR PURANIK Director RANJIT ANAND PURANIK Director ANAND DINKAR KARVE Director