SHAILENDRA PARMESHWARJI MITTAL
-
About SHAILENDRA PARMESHWARJI MITTAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L63040GA1949PLC000168 TRADE WINGS LIMITED 30000000.0 Active 30/06/1988 - U32300MH1922PLC000999 S.ROSE AND COMPANY LIMITED 3038240.0 Amalgamated 26/04/2004 - U55101GA1989PLC000966 TRADE WINGS HOTELS LIMITED. 9900200.0 Active 01/10/1996 - U63040GA1989PTC000965 TRADE WINGS TOURS PRIVATE LIMITED 500200.0 Amalgamated 02/06/2000 - U64120GA1995PTC001798 ABI EXPRESS PRIVATE LIMITED 2002000.0 Amalgamated 14/03/1995 - U67120MH1987PLC042728 BULLFINCH HOLDINGS LIMITED 1167000.0 Amalgamated 18/02/1989 - U80302GA1993PLC001323 TRADE WINGS INFOTECH LIMITED 490000.0 Active 13/03/2000 - -
Associated with Directors