SHANKAR LAL AGRAWAL
-
About SHANKAR LAL AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27102WB2004PLC099732 SHRISTI ISPAT & ALLOYS LIMITED 44718000.0 Active 10/09/2004 - U27102WB2004PLC099733 MB SPONGE & POWER LIMITED 58320000.0 Active 10/09/2004 - U27102WB2004PTC097594 BENGAL SPONGE MANUFACTURERS MINING PRIVATE LIMITED 24040000.0 Active 08/01/2004 - U27109WB2002PLC094878 M B ISPAT CORPORATION LIMITED 87570000.0 Active 01/02/2003 - U27310WB2013PTC197255 MAHA GAURI STRIPS PRIVATE LIMITED 35020000.0 Active 26/12/2014 - U51900WB2001PLC093090 SHRISTI CEMENT LIMITED 62060000.0 Active 09/04/2001 - U65999WB1993PLC057424 RITESH TRADEFIN LTD 59917000.0 Active 08/01/1993 - U74900WB2014PLC201530 MARVELLA TILES LIMITED 15700000.0 Active 27/03/2014 - -
Associated with Directors