SUCHITA KOTHARI
-
About SUCHITA KOTHARI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2007PTC114760 PANACEA INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 210000.0 Active 19/02/2008 - U51109WB2008PTC121870 SUCHITA TRADELINK PRIVATE LIMITED 440000.0 Active 18/01/2008 - U70102WB2014PTC199825 SANAYUKT PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/06/2017 - U70102WB2014PTC199835 SANAYUKT PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/06/2017 - U70109WB2009PTC135574 BABA RAMDEO APARTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 380000.0 Active 02/06/2009 - U74140WB2005PTC104645 SUCHITA TRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 735000.0 Active 09/08/2005 - U74999WB2004PTC097848 FABOULS CIVIL CONTRACTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 350000.0 Active 25/09/2008 - -
Associated with Directors
RAJ KUMAR MUNDHRA Director SHREE MOHAN KOTHARI Director SAIBAL KANTI JANA Director MADHU KABRA Director