SHARDA MAHAVIRPRASAD AGARWAL
-
About SHARDA MAHAVIRPRASAD AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24110MH1991PTC059979 VINERGY INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 14218500.0 Active 24/01/1991 - U30005MH1999PTC117939 CHEMICALEXCHANGE.COM (BOMBAY) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/02/2000 - U63090MH2008PTC177593 VINERGY GLOBAL TANKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Active 01/09/2015 - U70101MH1994PTC081842 FIXWELL DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 4600000.0 Amalgamated 20/11/2004 - U99999MH1981PTC118518 ARKAY SALES AND SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 31/10/1991 - -
Associated with Directors
MUKUL MAHAVIRPRASAD AGARWAL Director SUMAN MUKUL AGARWAL Director ANIL HIMATSINGANI Director