SUNIL ARJAN LULLA
-
About SUNIL ARJAN LULLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L99999MH1994PLC080502 EROS INTERNATIONAL MEDIA LIMITED 946283800.0 Active 19/08/1994 - U33111TN1984PTC010826 UNIVERSAL POWER SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/08/2015 - U40105MH2007PTC173735 EROS TELEVISION INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2007 - U40300DL2010PTC198011 EROS ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 4628640.0 Active 15/02/2010 - U92100MH2008PTC186402 EROS ANIMATION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/09/2008 - U92100TN2007PTC072223 AYNGARAN INTERNATIONAL MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 219000.0 Active 27/08/2007 - U92110MH2005PTC156504 BIG SCREEN ENTERTAINMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/01/2007 - U92113MH1994PTC080423 EROS INTERNATIONAL FILMS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000000.0 Active 18/08/1994 - U92114MH1999PTC118496 EROS DIGITAL PRIVATE LIMITED 1085090.0 Active 24/02/1999 - U92120MH2007PTC175027 EYEQUBE STUDIOS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/10/2007 - U92140MH2008PTC178628 EM PUBLISHING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/02/2008 - U92412MH2013PTC248167 COLOUR YELLOW PRODUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/08/2014 - -
Associated with Directors