SHYAM SUNDER GUPTA
-
About SHYAM SUNDER GUPTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15310GJ2006PTC047685 VINAYAK FLOUR MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 07/02/2006 - U15311GJ1962PTC001133 KOHINOOR FLOUR MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 1487400.0 Active 09/05/2008 - U15311MH1988PTC047820 SARASWATI ROLLER FLOUR MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 2400000.0 Active 16/07/2008 - U74899DL1994PLC058944 K C SPINNERS LIMITED 25200000.0 Active 09/11/1995 - -
Associated with Directors