SUNITA SURI
-
About SUNITA SURI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15114PB1998PTC021011 BACKHOME FOODS AND FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 9503000.0 Active 12/11/2005 - U15520PB1998PTC021009 SILVERRING DRINKS PRIVATE LIMITED 9503000.0 Active 27/01/1998 - U24232HP2000PLC023823 MOREPEN BIOTECH LIMITED 88655700.0 Active 26/08/2003 - U74899DL1994PTC056775 SOLACE INVESTMENTS AND FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 63744200.0 Active 30/08/2005 - U74899DL1994PTC056832 SOLITARY INVESTMENTS AND FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 1159700.0 Active 10/01/1994 - U74899DL1994PTC056846 MID-MED FINANCIAL SERVICES AND INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 63221630.0 Active 31/08/2005 - U74899DL1994PTC056961 SCOPE CREDITS AND FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 71009200.0 Active 07/11/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
ANJU SURI Director SHALU SURI Director SURUCHI PATHAK Director SANJAY SURI Director SUSHIL SURI Director