SANTOSH KUMAR GOENKA
-
About SANTOSH KUMAR GOENKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17111WB1995PTC070346 NIRMAL SAREE MANDIR PVT.LTD. 2592000.0 Active 29/03/1995 - U22210WB2001PTC093819 NIRMAL DYEING & PRINTING PRIVATE LIMITED 8230000.0 Active 20/11/2002 - U45201WB2003PTC096528 S. A. PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 940000.0 Active 07/07/2003 - U51909WB1995PTC070716 NIRMAL EMPORIUM PVT.LTD. 3504500.0 Active 16/07/2004 - U51909WB2008PTC129563 PANASIAN IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 14040000.0 Active 23/09/2008 - U65910WB1988PTC045494 GANESHMULL SAMPATLAL FINANCE & LEASING PVT LTD 11937900.0 Active 04/06/2005 - U67120WB1994PTC066522 TIRUPATI STOCK BROKING & SERVICES PVT. LTD. 10146000.0 Active 21/07/2005 - U67120WB1995PTC070344 NIRMAL INVESTMENTS PVT.LTD. 4682000.0 Active 29/03/1995 - U70101WB2006PTC109681 BARSANA CLUBS & RESORTS PVT LTD 2053000.0 Active 30/05/2006 - U70109WB2012PTC184955 HOWRAH HAAT DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 27/09/2012 - -
Associated with Directors