SHITAL SUNIT MEHRA
-
About SHITAL SUNIT MEHRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U32200MH1994PTC079498 INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL OF CORPORATE ETIQUETTE & PROTOCOL PRIVATE LIMITED 210000.0 Active 07/07/1994 - U74140MH1996PTC099358 MASAS CONSULTANTS INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 700000.0 Active 02/06/2006 - U74910MH2006PTC161303 FLEXI STAFFING SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 995000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 21/04/2006 - U91120MH2006NPL159546 HUMAN CAPITAL FOR THIRD SECTOR 4000.0 Active 07/02/2006 - -
Associated with Directors
SUNIT OM PRAKASH MEHRA Director MANOJ THELAKKAT CHITTUR Director