SUDHIR SETH
-
About SUDHIR SETH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U31200DL2009PLC190575 SUDHIR SALES & SERVICES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 25/05/2009 - U31501DL2011PTC226928 SUDHIR CAST RESIN TRANSFORMERS PRIVATE LIMITED 65000000.0 Active 02/11/2011 - U45201DL2004PTC128188 AVYA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U45201DL2005PTC136318 HEIGHTS INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 10100000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U45203DL2005PTC140380 MAGNA INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U45400DL2008PTC175280 SUNSHINE BUILDESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 20100000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U65921DL1996PTC077710 PRUDENCE CAPITAL AND MONEY MARKETS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U70100DL2013PTC247867 A2Z INFRAHEIGHTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U70100DL2013PTC248100 LIGHT INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2016 - U70102DL2007PLC160912 SUDHIR POWER PROJECTS LIMITED 1622590.0 Active 21/03/2007 - U72200DL2005PTC136020 MASTER INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U74899DL1989PTC035027 PERFECT COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U74899DL1995PLC073261 SUDHIR POWER LIMITED 47286750.0 Active 02/09/2006 - -
Associated with Directors