SUNILKUMAR VERAWDAN TAPARIA
-
About SUNILKUMAR VERAWDAN TAPARIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01100MH1995PLC087933 JYOTSNA PLANTATIONS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 04/06/2012 - U01110MH1994PTC080278 VARIJ PLANTATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 04/06/2012 - U17110MH1986PTC042005 TAPARIA MAGNETICS PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Amalgamated 05/12/1988 - U51109MH1992PLC067482 SUYOG AGENCIES LIMITED 28605000.0 Amalgamated 13/06/1992 - U51900MH1953PTC020284 SHRI NIWAS COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 20/08/2001 - U51900MH1987PLC045033 SYNAGOGUE IMPEX LIMITED 31008000.0 Active 17/07/1995 -