SANJEEV AGGARWAL
-
About SANJEEV AGGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200DL2008PTC172866 ADMIRE INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/05/2010 - U70109DL1997PTC088323 ANI-KAR INFRASTRUCTURE DEVELOPMENT CO PRIVATE LIMITED 19095200.0 Active 03/07/1997 - U72200DL2005PTC136327 RAGA SOFTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 65100000.0 Active 01/10/2005 - U74899DL1995PTC071949 FAUNA & FLORA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 391200.0 Converted to LLP 24/08/1995 - -
Associated with Directors
RAJEEV AGARWAL Director JAI CHAND GUPTA Director