SAROJ BHOTIKA
-
About SAROJ BHOTIKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109WB1997PTC083876 BHOTIKA BROTHERS WELDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 9300000.0 Active 04/04/1997 - U51109WB2005PTC105811 AAWAGAMAN MERCHANDISE PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 30/09/2010 - U51909DL1998PTC095517 AS PIPELINE CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 1327000.0 Active 12/08/1998 - U75131WB2001PTC093696 ROSEBAY GARDENS PRIVATE LIMITED 1998450.0 Active 10/01/2007 - U80904DL1998PTC094581 SHEKHAWATI EDUHUB PRIVATE LIMITED 2422000.0 Active 19/06/1998 - -
Associated with Directors
ABHISHEK BHOTIKA Director POONAM BHOTIKA Director SUDEEP GOYAL Director PARES NATH AGARWAL Director