SANJAY JAMANDAS THAKRAR
-
About SANJAY JAMANDAS THAKRAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U35110GJ2005PTC045900 SWAYAM SHIPPING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 7748920.0 Active 01/11/2011 - U45200GJ2006PTC047593 MAHADEV INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 1220330.0 Active 22/12/2009 - U51909GJ2003PTC043207 SYNERGY TRADELINK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/11/2003 - U63090GJ2010PTC063303 SYNERGY SEAPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/11/2011 - U91110GJ1967GAP001454 KANDLA STEVEDORES ASSOCIATION LIMITED 0.0 Active 13/08/2003 - -
Associated with Directors