SUDHIR SHAH
-
About SUDHIR SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18109WB1983PTC037009 K.K.DESIGNS PVT LTD 2400000.0 Active 22/08/1986 - U64201WB1989PTC047523 RELIABLE ROTO MOULDERS P LTD 3500000.0 Active 06/09/1989 - U67120WB1995PTC073069 TARANG STOCK BROKING SERVICES PVT LTD 800000.0 Active 14/01/2002 - U70101WB1937PTC009160 KESHOWJEE PROPERTIES PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 27/06/1988 -