SHAILESH MULCHAND SAVLA
-
About SHAILESH MULCHAND SAVLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01110MH2006PTC159611 S SAVLA AGROFARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/02/2006 - U14200MH2013PTC249600 S SAVLA MINING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/10/2013 - U45200MH2005PTC158435 S SAVLA CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/12/2005 - U45201MH2007PTC174182 J S PROPERTIES AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/02/2008 - U45202MH2010PTC205925 S SAVLA REALITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/07/2010 - U45400MH2010PTC206137 BLACK STONE LANDSCAPES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/07/2013 - U45400MH2010PTC206507 S SAVLA INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/08/2010 - U67120MH1993PLC257373 TIMES SECURITIES LTD 19967000.0 Active 25/06/2004 - U70109MH2013PTC249331 S SAVLA ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/10/2013 - U74120MH2013PTC249751 S SAVLA ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/11/2013 - U74900MH2013PTC245432 TRINITY INFRA & ECO SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/07/2013 - U74999RJ1992PTC022017 MA KAMAKHYAENCLAVE AND HOLDING PRIVATE LIMITED 22394000.0 Active 30/06/2014 - U90000MH2014PTC253909 TRINITY-IEC WASTE MANAGEMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2014 - -
Associated with Directors