SANKARAN RADHAKRISHNAN
-
About SANKARAN RADHAKRISHNAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L45200MH1987PLC042378 MUKAND ENGINEERS LIMITED 125724000.0 Active 07/02/2012 - U04010MH1993PLC171444 INDIA THERMAL POWER LIMITED 500710.0 Active 11/07/1995 - U27200MH1971PLC015205 VIDYAVIHAR CONTAINERS LIMITED 1197676200.0 Active 29/09/2012 - U27300MH2012PLC234000 MUKAND SUMI METAL PROCESSING LIMITED 273000000.0 Active 11/02/2015 - U27310MH2015PTC260936 MUKAND ALLOY STEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/12/2017 - U28910MH1966PLC013399 BOMBAY FORGINGS LIMITED 8000933.36 Active 27/07/1999 - U67120MH1979PLC021418 MUKAND GLOBAL FINANCE LIMITED 117495000.0 Active 16/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors