SANJAY MITTRA
-
About SANJAY MITTRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U10300DL2007PLC171250 DALMIA CEMENT VENTURES LIMITED 1617110000.0 Amalgamated 10/12/2007 - U13209ML2007PTC008281 SUTNGA MINES PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 02/05/2008 - U24233DL2007PLC166943 DALMIA SUGAR VENTURES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 13/08/2007 - U26959ML2007PLC008279 COSMOS CEMENTS LIMITED 140000000.0 Active 02/05/2008 - U65191TN1996PLC035962 HEMSHILA PROPERTIES LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 04/07/1996 - U65993TN1996PLC035964 D.I. PROPERTIES LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 04/07/1996 - U65993TN1996PLC035965 GEETEE ESTATES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 04/07/1996 - U65993TN1997PLC037308 SHRI RANGAM PROPERTIES LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 10/01/1997 - U67120DL1979PLC040218 ANUPAMA INVESTMENT LIMITED 3345000.0 Amalgamated 15/09/1984 - -
Associated with Directors