SANTOSH KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About SANTOSH KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27209WB1971PLC028015 INDIAN BASE METALS CO LTD 30013000.0 Active 18/08/2014 - U01132WB1938PLC009444 RAHIMPUR TEA CO. LTD. 4950000.0 Active 17/11/1998 - U01132WB1991PTC053656 BRIM TRADING & HOLDINGS PVT LTD 702000.0 Active 13/09/2013 - U15122WB2014PTC199724 MOGULKATA TEA COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 39200000.0 Active 24/01/2014 - U15319RJ2004PTC019936 KHATAN FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/08/2012 25/03/2017 U15431WB1918PTC001448 SIMULBARIE TEA CO PVT LTD 14915000.0 Active 11/05/2002 - U15491WB1998PTC087889 BIHAR BENGAL TEA COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 26/08/2013 - U51909WB2013PTC194317 BANSAL AGRO BEVERAGES PRIVATE LIMITED 12123000.0 Active 06/06/2013 - -
Associated with Directors