SUBRATA ROY SAHARA
-
About SUBRATA ROY SAHARA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U14220WB2007PLC119475 SAHARA UNIVERSAL MININGS CORPORATION LIMITED 8523500000.0 Active 17/03/2011 31/03/2015 U15432MH2012PLC229066 SUDHIR CHANDRA SAHARA SUGAR INDUSTRY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 01/04/2012 - U45200MH2006PLC160730 AAMBY VALLEY LIMITED 27842385280.0 Active 03/08/2017 - U45201UP2005PTC030074 SAHARA STAR RIVER DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/10/2010 - U45201UP2005PTC030076 SAHARA REALTORS AND DEVELOPER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/2010 - U45201UP2005PTC030261 SAHARA ROSE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/10/2010 - U45201UP2005PTC030262 SAHARA LOTUS HILL DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/10/2010 - U45201UP2005PTC030324 SAHARA EARTH DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/10/2010 - U45201UP2005PTC030329 SAHARA GREEN DEVELOPER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/10/2010 - U45201UP2005PTC030827 ERIC CITY HOMES DEVELOPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/09/2007 - U85110MH1997PLC109186 SAHARA INDIA MEDICAL INSTITUTE LIMITED 1500000000.0 Active 29/08/2016 - U85320WB1995NPL072099 SAHARA WELFARE FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 12/06/1995 - -
Associated with Directors