SHARAD KAILASHCHANDRA AGRAWAL
-
About SHARAD KAILASHCHANDRA AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15122MH2010PTC199097 SHIRUR SUGAR AND POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 20/01/2010 - U15500MH2010PTC199331 KARJAT SUGAR MANUFACTURING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 25/01/2010 - U27100MH1994PTC076941 SHREE RAMDEOBABA STEELS P LTD 3004000.0 Active 04/03/1994 - U45203MH2000PTC124022 21ST CENTURY INFRASTRUCTURE INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 6360200.0 Active 03/02/2000 - U51109WB2008PTC128143 GEMINI VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 7697500.0 Active 11/06/2012 - U51909WB2008PTC129202 SHALIMAR VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 7142500.0 Active 11/06/2012 - U52100WB2010PTC147410 DESIRE BARTER PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/07/2014 - U52100WB2010PTC147411 INSPIRE TRACOM PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/07/2014 - U74140WB2010PTC146134 BLACKBERRY MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/10/2013 - U74900WB2010PTC146105 ARROW FINANCIAL CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/10/2013 - U93030MH2010PTC209065 21ST CENTURY BROADCASTING ENTERTAINMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 5400000.0 Active 15/10/2010 - -
Associated with Directors
DIPEN KAILASHCHANDRA AGRAWAL Director SANJAY KAILASHCHANDRA AGRAWAL Director VEDANT AGRAWAL Director