SHEKHAR SWARUP
-
About SHEKHAR SWARUP,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L74899DL1993PLC052177 GLOBUS SPIRITS LIMITED 287992680.0 Active 26/05/2012 - U15122DL2012PLC243589 GLOBUS TROIS FRERES INDIA LIMITED 500000.0 Active 15/10/2012 - U15122DL2014PLC273878 UNIBEV LIMITED 12786950.0 Active 08/12/2014 - U15400DL2012PTC246131 GLOBUS FEEDS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/12/2012 - U15549DL2010PLC209849 HIMALAYAN SPIRITS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 26/10/2010 - U15549DL2011PLC226557 GLOBUS SPIRITS (JHARKHAND) LIMITED 500000.0 Active 20/10/2011 - U65921DL1993PLC052661 CHANDBAGH INVESTMENTS LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 20/05/2013 - U80300DL2007NPL167139 SIR SHADI LAL HIGHER SECONDARY SCHOOL 100000.0 Active 19/11/2011 - -
Associated with Directors