SWAPNIL SUDHIR BAOKAR
-
About SWAPNIL SUDHIR BAOKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40300MH2012PTC231750 SPARKMATICS ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/07/2012 - U45400MH2012PTC238277 ASR INFRABUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/11/2012 - U45400MH2014PTC258712 ATOM BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/10/2014 - U72200MH2014PTC257420 MAHESHWAR ANALYTICS AND SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 25/04/2016 - U72900MH2011PTC220191 MZAYA PRIVATE LIMITED 10080000.0 Active 04/07/2012 - U74999MH2010PTC207898 NAB SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/09/2010 - U93030MH2012PTC234327 COREDATAMATICS SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/08/2012 - U93030MH2013PTC248211 SOLEIL VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/09/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
DILNASHIN SANJAY DUTT Director RADHIKA SWAPNIL BAOKAR Director