SURENDRA KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About SURENDRA KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U26109WB1940PTC010286 THE CENTRAL GLASS INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 426950.0 Active 06/12/1983 - U27104WB1982PTC034458 AVON METALS PVT LTD 600000.0 Active 14/10/1991 - U51109WB2008PTC122348 AYUSHMAN COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 2710000.0 Active 01/02/2011 - U51909WB2008PTC123184 MOUNTVIEW VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 2170000.0 Active 07/07/2011 -